This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 11:03:18 (UTC).

MARYCRUZ PEREZ VS ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 MARYCRUZ PEREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0574

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ MARYCRUZ

Defendants

MARTINEZ ELIZA

ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK

ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KHOUSADIAN ALISA

ARTHUR SEZGIN

Defendant Attorney

ZEE CANDICE TERRY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/14/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/14/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

9/1/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE BINDING ARBITRATION

10/8/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE BINDING ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/8/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER SETTING A POST ARBITRA...) OF 10/20/2020

10/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER SETTING A POST ARBITRA...) OF 10/20/2020

Case Management Statement

10/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Order - ORDER ORDER RE: BINDING ARBITRATION

10/20/2020: Order - ORDER ORDER RE: BINDING ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER SETTING A POST ARBITRA...)

10/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER SETTING A POST ARBITRA...)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE BINDING ARBITRATION, WORD DOC

10/8/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE BINDING ARBITRATION, WORD DOC

Request for Refund / Order

12/28/2020: Request for Refund / Order

Request for Dismissal

8/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Arbitration) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Non-Appearance Case Review (Court Order Setting a Post Arbitration Status Conference) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MARYCRUZ PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketOrder (Order RE: Binding Arbitration); Filed by ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketOrder (Re: Binding Arbitration); Filed by MARYCRUZ PEREZ (Plaintiff); ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Setting a Post Arbitra...) of 10/20/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE BINDING ARBITRATION); Filed by MARYCRUZ PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK, a California corporation (Defendant); ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARYCRUZ PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARYCRUZ PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARYCRUZ PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK AKA LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE URGENT CARE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEE CANDICE TERRY