Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2021 at 08:46:13 (UTC).

MARYAM MOMENY VS ROXANNE KUCZEK

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 MARYAM MOMENY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROXANNE KUCZEK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0955

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOMENY MARYAM

Defendant

KUCZEK ROXANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAITIN LEONARD

Defendant Attorney

WILSON MARCELLA I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/10/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

6/19/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/19/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/24/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Hearing09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Hearing09/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Roxanne Kuczek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Roxanne Kuczek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Roxanne Kuczek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maryam Momeny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maryam Momeny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maryam Momeny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maryam Momeny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less