Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 18:58:05 (UTC).

MARYAM ESLAMI VS DIANE DANIELS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 MARYAM ESLAMI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DIANE DANIELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0872

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESLAMI MARYAM

Defendants

EVEREST REALTY GROUP CALIFORNIA LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA CENTURY 21 EVEREST

SIEMON CHARLENE

THE ESTATE OF ANNE E ARCHER DECEASED

GRECH KENNETH

DANIELS DIANE

DIANE DANIELS TRUSTEE OF THE THOMAS EARL ARCHER LIVING TRUST

Not Classified By Court

JONATHAN B. LAFRANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAFRANCE JONATHAN BAXTER

Defendant Attorneys

COOPER AMY J.

PACELLA LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/17/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/13/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

2/2/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/2/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Substitution of Attorney

2/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

9/14/2020: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/16/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

8/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request - REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE

8/10/2020: Request - REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE

Order - ORDER OF EXEMPTION FROM ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE

8/10/2020: Order - ORDER OF EXEMPTION FROM ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE

Notice of Lis Pendens

8/10/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Hearing03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 05/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Maryam Eslami (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Maryam Eslami (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Diane Daniels (Defendant); Diane Daniels, Trustee of the Thomas Earl Archer Living Trust, dated May 18, 2001 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Diane Daniels (Defendant); Diane Daniels, Trustee of the Thomas Earl Archer Living Trust, dated May 18, 2001 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Diane Daniels (Defendant); Diane Daniels, Trustee of the Thomas Earl Archer Living Trust, dated May 18, 2001 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maryam Eslami (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOrder of Exemption from Electronic Filing and Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketRequest (for Exemption from Mandatory Electronic Filing and Service); Filed by Maryam Eslami (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maryam Eslami (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maryam Eslami (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Maryam Eslami (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20VECV00872    Hearing Date: February 16, 2021    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING

20VECV00872 Eslami v Daniels

Motion to be relieved by Mr. LaFrance

GRANTED PROVIDED THAT a telephone number and email address for the client is in the order to be signed by the court

EFFECTIVE ONLY ON filing of proof of service of the conformed order on the client by mail and email

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Everest Realty Group California LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAFRANCE JONATHAN BAXTER