This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 18:02:41 (UTC).

MARY JESSIE FORTUNA VS COUNTRY VILLA EAST L.P., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 MARY JESSIE FORTUNA filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against COUNTRY VILLA EAST L P ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8902

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FORTUNA MARY JESSIE

FORTUNE LISA

Defendants

BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

COUNTRY VILLA EAST L.P.

OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE LLC

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHNEBERG KYLE P. ESQ.

AIDIKOFF JEFF B

Defendant Attorneys

SARRAO MICHAEL J.

EKPEBE VONA S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/19/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/15/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE ...)

8/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE ...)

Notice of Ruling

8/15/2023: Notice of Ruling

Substitution of Attorney

8/15/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/14/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

8/9/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

8/8/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFF AIDIKOFF RE: OSC SERVICE

8/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFF AIDIKOFF RE: OSC SERVICE

Case Management Statement

8/1/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/31/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

7/26/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/30/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE ...)

6/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE ...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/30/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/30/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/30/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Country Villa East L.P. (Defendant); As to: Mary Jessie Fortuna (Plaintiff); Lisa Fortune (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Country Villa East L.P. (Defendant); As to: Mary Jessie Fortuna (Plaintiff); Lisa Fortune (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mary Jessie Fortuna (Plaintiff); Lisa Fortune (Plaintiff); As to: Country Villa East L.P. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/13/2023; Service Cost: 175.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Mary Jessie Fortuna (Plaintiff); Lisa Fortune (Plaintiff); As to: Country Villa East L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Service as to Defendants Country Villa East L.P. and Boardwalk West Financial Services LLC. or Dismissal scheduled for 08/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 08/15/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Mary Jessie Fortuna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Olympia Health Care LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Service ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAddress for Kyle P. Schneberg, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kyle P. Schneberg, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name: P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mary Jessie Fortuna (Plaintiff); As to: Country Villa East L.P. (Defendant); Boardwalk West Financial Services, LLC (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mary Jessie Fortuna (Plaintiff); As to: Country Villa East L.P. (Defendant); Boardwalk West Financial Services, LLC (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mary Jessie Fortuna (Plaintiff); As to: Country Villa East L.P. (Defendant); Boardwalk West Financial Services, LLC (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less