This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 16:33:59 (UTC).

MARY J. KLING, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEE, ET AL. VS FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 MARY J KLING, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEE, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1594

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KLING INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEE MARY J.

CLIFFWOOD LLC A MISSOURI LLC

Defendants

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

DOE 1 THROUGH DOE 30 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLING ANTHONY N

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/19/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • Hearing04/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CLIFFWOOD LLC, a Missouri LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mary J. KLING, individually and as assignee (Plaintiff); CLIFFWOOD LLC, a Missouri LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mary J. KLING, individually and as assignee (Plaintiff); CLIFFWOOD LLC, a Missouri LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mary J. KLING, individually and as assignee (Plaintiff); CLIFFWOOD LLC, a Missouri LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mary J. KLING, individually and as assignee (Plaintiff); CLIFFWOOD LLC, a Missouri LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less