This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 13:47:31 (UTC).

MARY HANNAH VS MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 MARY HANNAH filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4709

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNAH MARY

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION

BENLIAN VAHE

BENLIAN BROS. CONSTRUCTION INC.

MALDOFF DAVID

KARAPETYAN SUREN

GOLDEN STATE DEMOLITION AND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC .

NS FREIGHT INC.

GOLDEN STATE ENTERPRISES INC.

NS CLEAN UP

NS ASSOCIATES LLC

SINGH NIRMAL

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBY EMILY

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CASEY ARTHUR J.

APANIAN MILENE

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

GLASS ZAKIYA N.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AS TO REMAININ...)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AS TO REMAININ...)

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CROSS-COMPLAINT MILWAUKEE COMPANY'S FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/1/2021: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CROSS-COMPLAINT MILWAUKEE COMPANY'S FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AS TO REMAININ...) OF 10/28/2021

10/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AS TO REMAININ...) OF 10/28/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AS TO REMAININ...)

10/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AS TO REMAININ...)

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney

6/30/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice of Settlement

5/21/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 05/26/2021

5/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 05/26/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2021: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

1/11/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAI...)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAI...)

Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMNATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

1/13/2021: Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMNATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Order - ORDER PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DAVID MALDOFFS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

1/13/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DAVID MALDOFFS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Answer

12/2/2020: Answer

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (As to Remaining Cross-Complaints Filed on 07/24/2020 and 11/02/2020) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) As to Remainin...) of 10/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) As to Remainin...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of OSC (Name Extension) (Notice of Continued Order to Show Cause Regarding Cross-Complaint Milwaukee Company's Failure to File Request for Dismissal); Filed by Mary Hannah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (As to Remaining Cross-Complaints Filed on 07/24/2020 and 11/02/2020) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) As to Remainin...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Vahe Benlian (Cross-Complainant); Benlian Bros. Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice as to the complaint ONLY); Filed by Mary Hannah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mary Hannah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Maldoff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by David Maldoff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mary Hannah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mary Hannah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mary Hannah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mary Hannah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENLIAN BROS. CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant