Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 18:28:26 (UTC).

MARY GRADY VS CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 MARY GRADY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA CLARITA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3545

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRADY MARY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TORO ENTERPRISES INC.

CITY OF SANTA CLARITA

Cross Defendant

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUTTING STACEY RAE

Defendant Attorneys

HAFFNER MATTHEW

HAMBLET BRIAN I.

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

5/26/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

5/26/2021: Answer

Answer

5/12/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/23/2021: PI General Order

Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2024
  • Hearing04/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • Hearing10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • Hearing09/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by City of Santa Clarita (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Santa Clarita (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Santa Clarita (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Toro Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mary Grady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mary Grady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mary Grady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mary Grady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mary Grady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORO ENTERPRISES INC . is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA CLARITA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUTTING STACEY RAE