This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 00:18:40 (UTC).

MARY ESPINOZA ET AL VS GIOVANNI D AMORE ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 MARY ESPINOZA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GIOVANNI D AMORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1243

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MARTIN LORI E.

ESPINOZA MARY

Defendants and Respondents

THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

DOES 1 TO 100

GIONVANNI D AMORE

INCOME ESTATES LLC

AMORE GIONVANNI D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AIN FARRIS E.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CLINTON DAVID A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND IPROPOSEDI ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/1/2018: STIPULATION AND IPROPOSEDI ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/17/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'A1ORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF RULING CONCERNING THEIR EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

9/18/2018: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'A1ORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF RULING CONCERNING THEIR EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

Unknown

12/5/2018: Unknown

DECLARATION OF GIOVANNI D'AMORE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALRNATWE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3/5/2018: DECLARATION OF GIOVANNI D'AMORE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALRNATWE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANM D'AMORE; INCOME ESTATES, LLC; AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNA

3/5/2018: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANM D'AMORE; INCOME ESTATES, LLC; AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNA

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE; INCOME ESTATES, LLC; AN]) THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3/5/2018: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE; INCOME ESTATES, LLC; AN]) THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE; INCOME ESTATES, LLC; AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF THE CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING ON THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MO

5/7/2018: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE; INCOME ESTATES, LLC; AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF THE CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING ON THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MO

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D' AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC; THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/26/2017: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D' AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC; THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/24/2017: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

10/13/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE

10/6/2017: DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/29/2017: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

5/12/2017: SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/21/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D? AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC; THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, MARY ESPINOZA AND LORI E. MARTIN?S FIRST AMEN

9/5/2017: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D? AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC; THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, MARY ESPINOZA AND LORI E. MARTIN?S FIRST AMEN

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D? AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC; THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF, LORI E. MARTIN?S TWELFTH CAUSE OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINT

9/5/2017: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D? AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC; THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF, LORI E. MARTIN?S TWELFTH CAUSE OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINT

Minute Order

9/12/2017: Minute Order

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 12/05/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Mary Espinoza (Plaintiff); Lori E. Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Gionvanni D Amore (Defendant); Income Estates, LLC (Defendant); The Monarch Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'A1ORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF RULING CONCERNING THEIR EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Gionvanni D Amore (Defendant); Income Estates, LLC (Defendant); The Monarch Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC; THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF, LORI E. MARTIN S TWELFTH CAUSE OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by Gionvanni D Amore (Defendant); Income Estates, LLC (Defendant); The Monarch Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Mary Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL TERMINATION; UNPAID WAGES; DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Mary Espinoza (Plaintiff); Lori E. Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A is a litigant

Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINTON DAVID A.