Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 05:12:21 (UTC).

MARY D. COLWICK TRUST DATED JUNE 17, 1985

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 MARY D COLWICK TRUST DATED JUNE 17, 1985 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KLEIN, CLIFFORD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7994

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Trustee

COLWICK ROY EARL

Not Classified By Court

MARY D. COLWICK TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SLATER CALVIN ALLEN

BALL ELIZABETH NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) - Petition for Order Confirming Successor Trustee and Trust Assets (850 Probate Code)

8/24/2018: Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) - Petition for Order Confirming Successor Trustee and Trust Assets (850 Probate Code)

Notice - Hearing

9/18/2018: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

11/5/2018: Minute Order

Order - Order Confirming Successor Trustee and Trust Assets

12/11/2018: Order - Order Confirming Successor Trustee and Trust Assets

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • Order (Order Confirming Successor Trustee and Trust Assets ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) (Petition for Order Confirming Successor Trustee and Trust Assets (850 Probate Code) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (. )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLATER CALVIN ALLEN