This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 05:42:16 (UTC).

MARY C. WILLIAMS VS THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF ANGELS, A CORPORATION SOLE

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 MARY C WILLIAMS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF ANGELS, A CORPORATION SOLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8614

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS MARY C.

Defendant

THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF ANGELS A CORPORATION SOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALI FAHD ZAFAR

Defendant Attorneys

GRANNIS FREDERIC FRANCIS

NOLAN PAUL J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

6/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 06/14/2022

6/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 06/14/2022

Order - Dismissal

6/14/2022: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

3/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Settlement

10/22/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

10/22/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

10/22/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT, AND COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARY C. WILLIAMS FOR A DEFENSE MEDICAL EXAM BY DEFENDANT THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY

9/14/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT, AND COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARY C. WILLIAMS FOR A DEFENSE MEDICAL EXAM BY DEFENDANT THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY

Notice of Change of Firm Name

9/14/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/14/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/15/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE TRIAL, ...)

9/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE TRIAL, ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/15/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 06/14/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29; Jury Trial (estimated at 5 days) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 04/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Cathedral of Our Lady of Angels, a Corporation Sole (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mary C. Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mary C. Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mary C. Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mary C. Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less