This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 19:45:29 (UTC).

MARY ACOSTA VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 MARY ACOSTA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5705

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACOSTA MARY

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

Defendant Attorney

VALENCIA JESSE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/11/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/24/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

6/13/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mary Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mary Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mary Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mary Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mary Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALENCIA JESSE