This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 05:37:08 (UTC).

MARY ABIAOLADAPO, ET AL. VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 MARY ABIAOLADAPO, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5650

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABIAOLADAPO MARY

ARAGON JOLENE

BAUTISTA CASSANDRA

BRIGGS TAMIKA

BROWN AMY

CASOLCO MARISELA

COLE ILYASAH

DAVID SABRINA

DAVIS CRAIG

DAVIS DEBRA

DHIRI SHAMAN

FORD SONYA

GARCIA ANDREA

GRIGSBY FLESHIA

HARDIMAN SAMEL

HARDIMAN SANDRA

HAYWOOD HARRIET

Defendants

CITY OF CARSON

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT DAVID

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MADISON TAYLOR)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MADISON TAYLOR)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (GRAYSON REESE)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (GRAYSON REESE)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (GABRIEL PARRENO)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (GABRIEL PARRENO)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (CARTER REESE)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (CARTER REESE)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (SALEAH RODRIQUEZ)

12/5/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (SALEAH RODRIQUEZ)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (SANIYAH RODRIQUEZ)

12/5/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (SANIYAH RODRIQUEZ)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MYA SAPP)

12/5/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MYA SAPP)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (GIANPAOLO PARRENO)

12/5/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (GIANPAOLO PARRENO)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (GRACE PARRENO)

12/5/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (GRACE PARRENO)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JAYLAN DAVIS)

12/5/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JAYLAN DAVIS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 11/28/2022

11/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 11/28/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

11/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

11/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/22/2022

11/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/22/2022

Notice of Related Case

11/21/2022: Notice of Related Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Madison Taylor); Signed and Filed by: Savanah Sewell (Plaintiff); As to: Madison Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Madison Taylor): Filed By: Savanah Sewell (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Grayson Reese); Signed and Filed by: Andrea Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Grayson Reese (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Grayson Reese): Filed By: Andrea Garcia (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Carter Reese); Signed and Filed by: Andrea Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Carter Reese (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Carter Reese): Filed By: Andrea Garcia (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Gabriel Parreno); Signed and Filed by: Andrea Parreno (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriel Parreno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Mya Sapp); Signed and Filed by: Amber Hemphill (Plaintiff); As to: Mya Sapp (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Mya Sapp): Filed By: Amber Hemphill (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Gianpaolo Parreno); Signed and Filed by: Andrea Parreno (Plaintiff); As to: Gianpaolo Parreno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 11/22/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Mary Abiaoladapo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mary Abiaoladapo (Plaintiff); Jolene Aragon (Plaintiff); Cassandra Bautista (Plaintiff); Tamika Briggs (Plaintiff); Amy Brown (Plaintiff); Marisela Casolco (Plaintiff); Ilyasah Cole (Plaintiff); Sabrina David (Plaintiff); Craig Davis (Plaintiff); Debra Davis (Plaintiff); Jaylan Davis (Plaintiff); Shaman Dhiri (Plaintiff); Sonya Ford (Plaintiff); Andrea Garcia (Plaintiff); Fleshia Grigsby (Plaintiff); Samel Hardiman (Plaintiff); Sandra Hardiman (Plaintiff); Harriet Haywood (Plaintiff); Jamar Haywood (Plaintiff); Keenan Haywood (Plaintiff); Laron Haywood (Plaintiff); Amber Hemphill (Plaintiff); Mary Hemphill (Plaintiff); Laila Jackson (Plaintiff); Dan Johnson (Plaintiff); Lauren Jackson (Plaintiff); Tonya Jenkins (Plaintiff); Rosalie Latchison (Plaintiff); Sandra Latchison (Plaintiff); Jason Latchison-Bullard (Plaintiff); Isaac Latchison, II (Plaintiff); Isaac Lewis (Plaintiff); Monica Mills-Douglas (Plaintiff); Ryan Mullany (Plaintiff); James Murdock, III (Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mary Abiaoladapo (Plaintiff); Jolene Aragon (Plaintiff); Cassandra Bautista (Plaintiff); Tamika Briggs (Plaintiff); Amy Brown (Plaintiff); Marisela Casolco (Plaintiff); Ilyasah Cole (Plaintiff); Sabrina David (Plaintiff); Craig Davis (Plaintiff); Debra Davis (Plaintiff); Jaylan Davis (Plaintiff); Shaman Dhiri (Plaintiff); Sonya Ford (Plaintiff); Andrea Garcia (Plaintiff); Fleshia Grigsby (Plaintiff); Samel Hardiman (Plaintiff); Sandra Hardiman (Plaintiff); Harriet Haywood (Plaintiff); Jamar Haywood (Plaintiff); Keenan Haywood (Plaintiff); Laron Haywood (Plaintiff); Amber Hemphill (Plaintiff); Mary Hemphill (Plaintiff); Laila Jackson (Plaintiff); Dan Johnson (Plaintiff); Lauren Jackson (Plaintiff); Tonya Jenkins (Plaintiff); Rosalie Latchison (Plaintiff); Sandra Latchison (Plaintiff); Jason Latchison-Bullard (Plaintiff); Isaac Latchison, II (Plaintiff); Isaac Lewis (Plaintiff); Monica Mills-Douglas (Plaintiff); Ryan Mullany (Plaintiff); James Murdock, I

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.; is a litigant