This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 18:41:59 (UTC).

MARVIN HERRERA VS THE BICYCLE CASINO INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 MARVIN HERRERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE BICYCLE CASINO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL FEUER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6608

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERRERA MARVIN

Respondents and Defendants

THE BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO

THE BICYCLE CASION INC

THE BICYCLE CASINO LP

DOES 1 TO 20

THE BICYCLE CASINO

THE BICYCLE CASINO A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

THE BICYCLE CASINO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YOUNESSI RAMIN R. ESQ.

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY ESQ.

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

FELDMAN CARLA ESQ.

FELDMAN CARLA J ESQ.

FELDMAN CARLA J

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

8/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/19/2019

8/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/19/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Ruling

9/25/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

1/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

1/23/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

DECLARATION OF CARLOS ANDRES PEREZ IN ADVANCE OF THE POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

7/12/2018: DECLARATION OF CARLOS ANDRES PEREZ IN ADVANCE OF THE POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order -

7/19/2018: Minute Order -

Declaration - Declaration of Carlos Andres Perez in Advance of the Post Arbitration Status Conference

11/8/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Carlos Andres Perez in Advance of the Post Arbitration Status Conference

Declaration - Declaration of Amy B. Pinske Re: Status of Arbitration For November 16, 2018 Arbitration Status Conference

11/13/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Amy B. Pinske Re: Status of Arbitration For November 16, 2018 Arbitration Status Conference

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/28/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

NOTICE OF ORDER

12/13/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

9/19/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAIIAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.;ETC

9/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAIIAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.;ETC

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marvin Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Marvin Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (In advance of Order to Show Cause Dismissal/Settlement); Filed by Marvin Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by THE BICYCLE CASINO LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marvin Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAIIAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BICYCLE CASINO A PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY