This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 00:20:33 (UTC).

MARVIN CANO ET AL VS AMBER NICOLE MILLERLEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 MARVIN CANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMBER NICOLE MILLERLEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4236

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ZAPIEN NATALIE

CANO MARVIN

HERRERA LESLIE

HERRERA LORI

CANO AARON

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MILLERLEE AMBER NICOLE

ADKINS STEPHANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH PIUS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

9/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND SUBMITTAL OF DEF...)

9/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND SUBMITTAL OF DEF...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

8/31/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

8/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST

7/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AMBER NICOLE MILLERL

7/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AMBER NICOLE MILLERL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AMBER NICOLE MILL

7/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AMBER NICOLE MILL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIO

7/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 07/26/2021

7/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 07/26/2021

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UPCOMING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

4/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UPCOMING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AARON

4/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AARON

Summary of the Case - SUMMARY OF THE CASE CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS'EQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT

4/9/2021: Summary of the Case - SUMMARY OF THE CASE CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS'EQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND SUBMITTAL OF DEF...)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND SUBMITTAL OF DEF...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AS TO DEFENDANT, AMBER NICOLE MILLER...)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AS TO DEFENDANT, AMBER NICOLE MILLER...)

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UPCOMING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

3/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UPCOMING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/22/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • Hearing04/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Hearing03/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Hearing01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Marvin Cano (Plaintiff); Lori Herrera (Plaintiff); Natalie Zapien (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default and Submittal of Default Judgment, as to Defendant, Stephanie Adkins,) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Submittal of Def...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Marvin Cano (Plaintiff); Lori Herrera (Plaintiff); Natalie Zapien (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Marvin Cano (Plaintiff); Lori Herrera (Plaintiff); Natalie Zapien (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketClerk's Application to Vacate and Order (-STEPHANIE ADKINS IS STRICKEN FROM THE ANSWER); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (DENIED); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer (-STEPHANIE ADKINS IS STRICKEN); Filed by Stephanie Adkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marvin Cano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marvin Cano (Plaintiff); Lori Herrera (Plaintiff); Natalie Zapien (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: BC694236\t\t Hearing Date: August 26, 2021 Dept: 29

Case name: BC694236\r\nMARVIN CANO ET AL VS AMBER NICOLE MILLERLEE ET AL

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Motion:

\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving Party: Plaintiffs Marvin Cano, Lori Herrera, Natalie\r\nZapien, Aaron Cano, and Leslie Herrera

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Responding Party: None [Defendant Amber Nicole Millerlee]

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE: Motions are GRANTED; Sanctions are DENIED.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Analysis: Plaintiffs served discovery requests and\r\nDefendant did not respond. The Court denies monetary sanctions because the\r\nnotice is inconsistent regarding the amount to be awarded. More specifically, the\r\ncaption of the motion states that Plaintiffs request $660.00 for each motion\r\nbut the body of the notice of motion says $2,050.00. Moving party to give notice.

'