This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 01:56:58 (UTC).

MARUSCHKA KABACHNIKOVA VS BUNNY A HALL ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 MARUSCHKA KABACHNIKOVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BUNNY A HALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9282

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KABACHNIKOVA MARUSCHKA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TOTH GUNTHER ERIK

HART & TOTH CABINET CO. LLC

SMITH CARLA

HALL BUNNY A.

HARAUTUNUEIAN KAREN

KAREN HARAUTUNEIAN INC

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD

HUB OF THE HOUSE LLC

HARAUTUEIAN KAREN

HART & TOTH CABINET CO.; LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOPIN ALBERT J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

PEARCE CHARLES WARDLAW ESQ.

FLANNERY COURTNEY DAWN ESQ.

SINGLETON DAVID MCCALLMAN ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HAITH SCOTT ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

SINGLETON DAVID MCCALLMAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/13/2020: Request for Dismissal

Order - ORDER RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION

11/13/2020: Order - ORDER RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - ; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/13/2020: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - ; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

11/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND GOOD ...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND GOOD ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND GOOD ...)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND GOOD ...)

Request for Dismissal

12/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AS RE-SCEDULED TO 10:30AM

8/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AS RE-SCEDULED TO 10:30AM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

8/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/27/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

3/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/30/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

12/23/2019: Case Management Statement

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department O; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maruschka Kabachnikova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReNotice of Settlement and Good Faith Settlement Application) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement and Good ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReNotice of Settlement and Good Faith Settlement Application) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement and Good ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maruschka Kabachnikova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Karen Harautunueian (Defendant); Carla smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer (to 1st Amended Complaint); Filed by Hart & Toth Cabinet Co., LLC (Defendant); Gunther Erik Toth (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Carla smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Karen Harautunueian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer (TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BUNNY A. HALL); Filed by Bunny A. Hall (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Maruschka Kabachnikova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN PERSONAL INJURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint ((1st)); Filed by Maruschka Kabachnikova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN PERSONAL INJURY FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION: PREMISES LIABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maruschka Kabachnikova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9282    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: 2

****9282 r/t 19STCV32598

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the West District, Santa Monica,  JUDGE H. JAY FORD presiding in Department 0 for all purposes except trial.  Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.  

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference.  Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record. 



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD is a litigant