This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 03:33:31 (UTC).

MARTY KING, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 MARTY KING filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN I. JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2825

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KING MARTY

GUILLEMOT DOMINICK

GUILLEMOT JUDITH

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

THE BOEING COMPANY

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICES LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRANGE BRIAN RUSSELL

Defendant Attorneys

BOUTROUS THEODORE JOSEPH JR

FLIGOR CRAIG ALEXANDER

TROPIO SCOTT THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-NINTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

8/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-NINTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

8/10/2021: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY FROM PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

8/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY FROM PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Answer - DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

8/13/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Answer

8/17/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

7/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-NINTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION

7/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-NINTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

7/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 07/02/2021

7/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 07/02/2021

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order Re: Twenty-Ninth Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order Re: Twenty-Ninth Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Universal Protection Services, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDefendant The Boeing Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by The Boeing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Strike Certain Allegations Against Defendant The Boeing Company from Plaintiffs' Complaint without Prejudice); Filed by Marty King (Plaintiff); Dominick Guillemot (Plaintiff); Judith Guillemot (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Answer To Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Submission Of Twenty-Ninth Petition For Coordination; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order RE Complex Determination); Filed by Marty King (Plaintiff); Dominick Guillemot (Plaintiff); Judith Guillemot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 11:11 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 07/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marty King (Plaintiff); Dominick Guillemot (Plaintiff); Judith Guillemot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marty King (Plaintiff); Dominick Guillemot (Plaintiff); Judith Guillemot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation is a litigant