This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:42:38 (UTC).

MARTUN SIMONYAN VS VAZGEN MIKAYELYAN

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 MARTUN SIMONYAN filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against VAZGEN MIKAYELYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1651

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMONYAN MARTUN

Defendant

MIKAYELYAN VAZGEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARSAMYAN VARDUI ROSE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/1/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/1/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

12/1/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

12/1/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (VAZGEN MIKAYELYAN)

12/2/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (VAZGEN MIKAYELYAN)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/2/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/17/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • Hearing04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Martun Simonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Vazgen Mikayelyan)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Martun Simonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Martun Simonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Martun Simonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARSAMYAN VARDUI ROSE