This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2023 at 12:03:36 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, ZULMA VS MARTINEZ, JOHN

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 MARTINEZ, ZULMA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARTINEZ, JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0952

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTINEZ ZULMA

Respondent

MARTINEZ JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSIAK RICHARD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Judgment

1/9/2023: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

1/9/2023: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated

12/2/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated

Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry

12/2/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry

Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170

12/2/2022: Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

11/1/2022: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

11/1/2022: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

11/1/2022: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry

11/1/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

11/1/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated

11/1/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

6/6/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

6/6/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/1/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

6/1/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

Summons - Summons

6/1/2022: Summons - Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

6/1/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/1/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry (Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170 (Declaration - Default FL170 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated (Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers (Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry (Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated (Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less