This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 01:08:54 (UTC).

RAMIREZ CARBALLO, RAFAEL ANTONIO VS MOJICA, ANA PATRICIA

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 RAMIREZ CARBALLO, RAFAEL ANTONIO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOJICA, ANA PATRICIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0128

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MARTINEZ KAREN

RAMIREZ CARBALLO RAFAEL ANTONIO

Respondents

RUIZ GENOVEVA

MOJICA ANA PATRICIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Notice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less