This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 18:51:37 (UTC).

MARTIN, NOEL VS MARTIN, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 MARTIN, NOEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MARTIN, RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AHARONOV, AMIR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0144

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AHARONOV, AMIR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTIN NOEL

Respondent

MARTIN RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

PITTERA JOSEPH LAMBERT

Respondent Attorney

BARSAMYAN VARDUI ROSE

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/28/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

1/28/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/28/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/28/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

1/28/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

1/31/2022: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice of Remote Appearance (Appearances)

2/16/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice of Remote Appearance (Appearances)

Substitution of Attorney - Sub in - Joseph L. Pittera, Esq.

2/10/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Sub in - Joseph L. Pittera, Esq.

Proof of Service

2/9/2022: Proof of Service

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - PARTLY GRANTED & PARTLY DENIED

1/31/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - PARTLY GRANTED & PARTLY DENIED

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/31/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Minute Order

2/23/2022: Minute Order

FCS-Mediation Memo

2/22/2022: FCS-Mediation Memo

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service (Comment)

2/22/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service (Comment)

Response - Domestic Violence

2/22/2022: Response - Domestic Violence

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service (Comment) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNotice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Notice of Remote Appearance (Appearances) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Sub in - Joseph L. Pittera, Esq. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (PARTLY GRANTED & PARTLY DENIED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARSAMYAN VARDUI ROSE