This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 09:49:01 (UTC).

MARTIN MARTINEZ VS TRICOLOR CALIFORNIA AUTO GROUP, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 MARTIN MARTINEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRICOLOR CALIFORNIA AUTO GROUP, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0658

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ MARTIN

Defendant

TRICOLOR CALIFORNIA AUTO GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISS ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

12/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal

4/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Martin Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Martin Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Martin Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Martin Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Martin Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRICOLOR CALIFORNIA AUTO GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS ANDREW