This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 01:50:38 (UTC).

MARTIN GONZALEZ VS THOMAS JUDE CORDOVA RAMOS

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by MARTIN GONZALEZ against THOMAS JUDE CORDOVA RAMOS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8027

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GONZALEZ MARTIN

Defendants and Respondents

RAMOS THOMAS JUDE CORDOVA

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

CORDOVA THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/22/2018: Answer

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/28/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SUMMONS

3/14/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

3/14/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Thomas Jude Cordova Ramos (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Thomas Cordova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Thomas Cordova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Martin Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Martin Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698027    Hearing Date: February 07, 2020    Dept: 32

Gonzalez v. Ramos

Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions

The Court has no tentative order.  Mr. Jehdian shall appear in person, as the Court deems this case not suitable for court call.  Should Mr. Jehdian not appear, he shall waive the right to be heard and shall submit to any decision the Court makes on this issue.