This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 16:04:49 (UTC).

MARTIN BADALYAN VS DAVID URIBES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 MARTIN BADALYAN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DAVID URIBES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS W. STERN and MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3813

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DOUGLAS W. STERN

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BADALYAN MARTIN

Defendants

ALVAREZ ALINA

DE & MG ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ERNANDES JACK

GONZALEZ MARTIN

HULLETT ENTERPRISE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LB FIBERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LONG BEACH RECYCLING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

URIBES DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ATTARAY MAINAK

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/31/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/31/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/31/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/31/2022: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RELATED CASE;) OF 02/03/2022

2/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RELATED CASE;) OF 02/03/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RELATED CASE;) OF 02/03/2022

2/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RELATED CASE;) OF 02/03/2022

Notice of Related Case

2/1/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • Hearing09/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78, Douglas W. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Martin Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Martin Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Martin Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Martin Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docketat 09:35 AM in Department , Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Related Case;) of 02/03/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Related Case;) of 02/03/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Martin Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Martin Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Martin Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Martin Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ATTARAY MAINAK