This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 18:00:13 (UTC).

MARTIN ARELLANO, ET AL. VS MARLON RODAS POLANCO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 MARTIN ARELLANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARLON RODAS POLANCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2088

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARELLANO MARIA

ARELLANO MARTIN

Defendants

POLANCO MARLON RODAS

SOTO DAISY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN DERRYL S.

Defendant Attorney

MANESH VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/23/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/3/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2024
  • Hearing06/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • Hearing12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marlon Rodas Polanco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Martin Arellano (Plaintiff); Maria Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Martin Arellano (Plaintiff); Maria Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Martin Arellano (Plaintiff); Maria Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Martin Arellano (Plaintiff); Maria Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Martin Arellano (Plaintiff); Maria Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANESH VICTORIA