This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 11:29:59 (UTC).

MARTHA RAMOS VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 MARTHA RAMOS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3911

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS MARTHA

Defendants

3M COMPANY

AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORPORATION FKA FOSTER WHEELER LLC FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

BALTIMORE AIRCOIL COMPANY

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.

CARRIER CORPORATION

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY FKA PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY

CRANE CO.

FAMILIAN CORP

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GOULDS PUMPS LLC FKA GOULDS PUMPS INC.

GRINNELL LLC DBA GRINNELL CORP.

KEENAN PROPERTIES INC. FKA KEENAN PIPE & SUPPLY FKA KEENAN SUPPLY

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC FKA METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

NIBCO INC.

POWERINE OIL COMPANY

SHELL OIL COMPANY

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL JOSHUA

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO EDWARD ROGER

BARBER STEVEN JOHN

BLEICHNER BRAD D.

FOLEY PATRICK J.

GOETZ ANDY J.

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

DAVIS GEOFFREY MARC

DEJARDIN BRADFORD J.

DUFFY JOSEPH

EMPTING ERIN NICOLE

ESTRADA MICHAEL J.

KIM JASON J.

MCCALL MICHAEL T.

RASMUSSEN JENNIFER C.

SHARP GARY DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

7/26/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (DOE AMENDMENT OF KEVIN RAMOS)

8/31/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (DOE AMENDMENT OF KEVIN RAMOS)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (DOE AMENDMENT OF KEVIN RAMOS)

8/31/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (DOE AMENDMENT OF KEVIN RAMOS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/19/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Status Conference Statement

10/25/2021: Status Conference Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (RAMOS-21STCV23911))

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (RAMOS-21STCV23911))

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

11/3/2021: Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Substitution of Attorney

1/12/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/17/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice - CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/7/2022: Notice - CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Notice - UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/7/2022: Notice - UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Taking MTC Familian Further Responses to Special Interrogatories Off Calendar); Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Taking MTC Familian Further Responses to Requests for Admission Off Calendar); Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Taking MTC Familian Further Responses to Form Interrogatories Off Calendar); Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Taking MTC Familian Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Off Calendar); Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendant Familian Corp's Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents; Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Peter C. Beirne in Support Thereof; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketSeparate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant Familian Corp's Further Responses to Form Interrogatories; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendant Familian Corp's Further Responses to Form Interrogatories; Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Peter C. Beirne in Support Thereof; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Preliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by Martha Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Powerine Oil Company is a litigant

Latest cases where FOSTER WHEELER USA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NIBCO Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BALTIMORE AIRCOIL COMPANY is a litigant