This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 02:12:27 (UTC).

MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST, ET AL. VS MOHAMMED I NOOR, AS TRUSTEE OF THE NOOR TRUST DATED DECEMBER 9, 2016, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MOHAMMED I NOOR, AS TRUSTEE OF THE NOOR TRUST DATED DECEMBER 9, 2016. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1042

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ HORACIO AMADOR AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST

SATRUSTEGUI MARTHA R AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST

Defendants

NOOR MARJORIE AS TRUSTEE OF THE NOOR TRUST

NOOR MOHAMMED I AS TRUSTEE OF THE NOOR TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAYLEY GUY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/11/2022: Complaint

Case Management Statement

5/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST (Plaintiff); HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST (Plaintiff); HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST (Plaintiff); HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HORACIO AMADOR MARTINEZ AND MARTHA R SATRUSTEGUI REVOCABLE TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD