This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 10:40:00 (UTC).

MARTHA LORENA CARTAGENA SAUCEDO VS ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 MARTHA LORENA CARTAGENA SAUCEDO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6370

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTAGENA SAUCEDO MARTHA LORENA

Defendant

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARARI NEAMA CORY

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/12/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

5/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULUATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

5/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULUATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

5/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

6/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE TO JULY 14, 2022

6/8/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE TO JULY 14, 2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE TO JULY 14, 2022]

6/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE TO JULY 14, 2022]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER CCP SECTION 664.6; [PROPOSED ORDER]

7/20/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER CCP SECTION 664.6; [PROPOSED ORDER]

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO DISMISS CASE WITH THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER CCP 664.6

7/22/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO DISMISS CASE WITH THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER CCP 664.6

Proof of Personal Service

3/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/3/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

2/22/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO DISMISS CASE WITH THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER CCP 664.6); Filed by MARTHA LORENA CARTAGENA SAUCEDO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Case with the Court to Retain Jurisdiction under CCP Section 664.6; [Proposed Order]); Filed by MARTHA LORENA CARTAGENA SAUCEDO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARTHA LORENA CARTAGENA SAUCEDO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARTHA LORENA CARTAGENA SAUCEDO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARTHA LORENA CARTAGENA SAUCEDO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARTHA LORENA CARTAGENA SAUCEDO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARARI NEAMA CORY