This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2022 at 13:04:51 (UTC).

MARTHA CRISTERNA VS FEDEX CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 MARTHA CRISTERNA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FEDEX CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5732

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRISTERNA MARTHA

Defendants

FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION

FEDEX CORPORATION

FEDEX EXPRESS

GOODNIGHT KENNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/16/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/16/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/15/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

11/15/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/15/2022

11/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/15/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/14/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

11/14/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/14/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Martha Cristerna (Plaintiff); As to: FedEx Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Martha Cristerna (Plaintiff); As to: FedEx Express (Defendant); Service Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Martha Cristerna (Plaintiff); As to: Federal Express Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Carney R. Shegerian (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Shegerian & Associates to Shegerian & Associates, Inc. Middle Name: R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAddress for Carney R. Shegerian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Martha Cristerna (Plaintiff); As to: FedEx Corporation (Defendant); Federal Express Corporation (Defendant); FedEx Express (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Martha Cristerna (Plaintiff); As to: FedEx Corporation (Defendant); Federal Express Corporation (Defendant); FedEx Express (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FedEx Express is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Express Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R