This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 16:23:31 (UTC).

MARTHA CAROLINA TOBAR, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 MARTHA CAROLINA TOBAR, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2160

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOBAR AN INDIVIDUAL JULIO CESAR

TOBAR AN INDIVIDUAL MARTHA CAROLINA

Defendants

ALARCON AN INDIVIDUAL GEOVANY

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANGOLI SHAWN L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/11/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/11/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/11/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/11/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2025
  • Hearing04/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARTHA CAROLINA TOBAR, an Individual (Plaintiff); JULIO CESAR TOBAR, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARTHA CAROLINA TOBAR, an Individual (Plaintiff); JULIO CESAR TOBAR, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARTHA CAROLINA TOBAR, an Individual (Plaintiff); JULIO CESAR TOBAR, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANGOLI SHAHRAM