This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 16:26:27 (UTC).

MARTHA ANN PRESLEY VS WALMART INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 MARTHA ANN PRESLEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6532

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESLEY MARTHA ANN

Defendants

SANDSTONE PROPERTIES L.P.

RELIABLE GENERAL PARTNER

CINTAS CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 3

CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2

WALMART INC.

WAL-MART ASSOCIATES INC.

WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY

WAL-MART TRS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M.

Defendant Attorney

KAJO VICTORIA T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/27/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

5/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/17/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL F. COLBERT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 IMPOSING AN AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

8/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL F. COLBERT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 IMPOSING AN AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Michael F. Colbert pursuant to CCP Section 430.41 Imposing an Automatic 30-Day Extension to Respond to Complaint); Filed by WALMART INC. (Defendant); WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. (Defendant); WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARTHA ANN PRESLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SANDSTONE PROPERTIES LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Realty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. is a litigant