Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 03:22:28 (UTC).

MARTA ANAYANSI LOPEZ ET AL VS THERESA MARIE BUSH ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 MARTA ANAYANSI LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THERESA MARIE BUSH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8190

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LOPEZ MARTA ANAYANSI

ALVARADO EBER

Defendants and Respondents

DOVICO TYRELL MORGAN

DOES 1 TO 50

BUSH THERESA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASHANI DAVID P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/12/2018: Request for Dismissal

SUMMONS

7/12/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/12/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Marta Anayansi Lopez (Plaintiff); Eber Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Marta Anayansi Lopez (Plaintiff); Eber Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASHANI DAVID P.