This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 11:17:25 (UTC).

MARRSHA LOSEY-SILL VS GEVIK MARCARIAN, D.D.S., AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 MARRSHA LOSEY-SILL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against GEVIK MARCARIAN, D D S , AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0357

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOSEY-SILL MARRSHA

Defendants

A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION GEVIK MARCARIAN D.D.S. INC.

AN INDIVIDUAL GEVIK MARCARIAN D.D.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY DANE

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN BRIAN L

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/26/2023: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/23/2023: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

3/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/23/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/5/2023: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., an individual (Defendant); Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., an individual (Defendant); Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Marrsha Losey-Sill (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF TRIAL ATTORNEY; Filed by: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., an individual (Defendant); Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., an individual (Defendant); Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Marrsha Losey-Sill (Plaintiff); As to: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 02/02/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Marrsha Losey-Sill (Plaintiff); As to: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., an individual (Defendant); Service Date: 02/02/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Marrsha Losey-Sill (Plaintiff); As to: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., an individual (Defendant); Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Marrsha Losey-Sill (Plaintiff); As to: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., an individual (Defendant); Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marrsha Losey-Sill (Plaintiff); As to: Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., an individual (Defendant); Gevik Marcarian, D.D.S., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less