This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 04:40:56 (UTC).

MARROQUIN, YALANY ARIANNA - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 MARROQUIN, YALANY ARIANNA - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KITCHENS, DEAN J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KITCHENS, DEAN J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARROQUIN CELENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

1/3/2022: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/3/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim - Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Claims)

4/28/2022: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim - Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Claims)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds - Order - Deposit Funds (Orders)

4/28/2022: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds - Order - Deposit Funds (Orders)

Minute Order

4/28/2022: Minute Order

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim - Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Claims)

4/28/2022: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim - Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Claims)

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

5/10/2022: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

Order - Deposit Funds

5/10/2022: Order - Deposit Funds

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 10:30 AM in Probate Department A12 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department A12, Kitchens, Dean J., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Claims) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Claims) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds (Order - Deposit Funds (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL