This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 20:06:28 (UTC).

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., AS MANAGER OF NEW YORK MARRIOTT MARQUIS VS MATTHEW GAVIN ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC , AS MANAGER OF NEW YORK MARRIOTT MARQUIS filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MATTHEW GAVIN ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0251

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC. AS MANAGER OF NEW YORK MARRIOTT MARQUIS

Defendant

MATTHEW GAVIN ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEFSBERG JOHN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

6/22/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT); Filed by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., as manager of NEW YORK MARRIOTT MARQUIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., as manager of NEW YORK MARRIOTT MARQUIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C Josefsberg