This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 01:56:06 (UTC).

MARO AVDESIAN, ET AL. VS AVON PRODUCTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 MARO AVDESIAN, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8697

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AVDESIAN MARO

NAYLOUS VERJ

Defendants

AVON PRODUCTS INC.

HENRY COMPANY LLC

M.A.C. COSMETICS INC

CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION;

PFIZER INC

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD

SHULTON INC.

MARY KAY INC.

ESTEE LAUDER INC

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC

SEPHORA CO. LLC

CHANEL INC

THE QUIKRETE COMPANIES LLC

SPECIALTY MINERALS INC.

WESTPAC MATERIALS LLC

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC FKA MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS INC.SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC.;

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PURDY STUART J.

Defendant Attorneys

DEJARDIN BRADFORD J.

GARRATT JUSTIN E.

KATERNDAHL JOHN PAUL

LEE JAE HONG

MCCLAIN FLORENCE ANNE

DUBOIS JACQUELINE K.

RIDLEY SHAWN M.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

WILLIAMSON IAN G.

MURRIN CHARLES PATRICK

REMILLARD THOMAS WILLIAM

SHELDON CHARLES TODD

STRUNK CHRISTOPHER D.

WEGLARZ CLAIRE C.

FAWLEY CAROLINE BROWN

Other Attorneys

NEWMARK JENNA C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER, P.C.))

8/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER, P.C.))

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

5/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE THAT MOTION TO QUASH BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLC ARE OFF CALENDAR; PROOF OF SERVICE

7/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE THAT MOTION TO QUASH BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLC ARE OFF CALENDAR; PROOF OF SERVICE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS THE EST E LAUDER COMPANIES INC., ESTEE LAUDER INC., AND M.A.C. COSMETICS INC.

7/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS THE EST E LAUDER COMPANIES INC., ESTEE LAUDER INC., AND M.A.C. COSMETICS INC.

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/2/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

8/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

9/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/21/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

180 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maro Avdesian on 10/07/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maro Avdesian and Verj Naylous as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Maro Avdesian (Plaintiff); Verj Naylous (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference RE: GROUP (SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER, PC) scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (AVDESIAN-20STCV38697) scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 01:46 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maro Avdesian on 10/07/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maro Avdesian and Verj Naylous as to Westpac Materials, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maro Avdesian on 10/07/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maro Avdesian and Verj Naylous as to Westpac Materials, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Maro Avdesian (Plaintiff); Verj Naylous (Plaintiff); As to: Westpac Materials, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maro Avdesian on 10/07/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maro Avdesian and Verj Naylous as to Brenntag North America, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Maro Avdesian (Plaintiff); Verj Naylous (Plaintiff); As to: Brenntag North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (AVDESIAN-20STCV38697) scheduled for 08/02/2022 at 01:46 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/14/2022 01:46 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
337 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/16/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maro Avdesian (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maro Avdesian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David S. Cunningham in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less