This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 00:33:54 (UTC).

MARLON RIVERA VS HANG MUN CHOI ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 MARLON RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HANG MUN CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1789

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RIVERA MARLON

Defendants and Respondents

CHOI HANG MUN

DOES 1 TO 100

WEAVER JOHN

WARNER BROS. [DOE 1]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHAFFER DOUGLAS D. ESQ.

SHAFFER DOUGLAS DURAN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

O'DOHERTY F.X. SEAN ESQ

SMITH KEVIN DEAN

KANDARIAN-STEIN GINA YVONNE ESQ

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

12/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Notice of Settlement

12/23/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)

11/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARLON RIVERA TO SUBMIT TO INDEPENDENT NEUROLOGICAL, ORTHOPEDIC, NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL, NEUROPSYCHIATRY EXAMINATIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE

11/4/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARLON RIVERA TO SUBMIT TO INDEPENDENT NEUROLOGICAL, ORTHOPEDIC, NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL, NEUROPSYCHIATRY EXAMINATIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARLON RI...)

11/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARLON RI...)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/28/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Protective Order

9/13/2019: Motion for Protective Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/04/2019

4/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/04/2019

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR

4/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR

Demand for Jury Trial - and Notice of Posting Jury Fees

10/9/2018: Demand for Jury Trial - and Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Answer -

10/9/2018: Answer -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

9/27/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANTS, HANG MUN CHOI, FRANK CHEN, AND MEIYEN CHEN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MARLON RIVERA'S COMPLAINT

5/3/2018: DEFENDANTS, HANG MUN CHOI, FRANK CHEN, AND MEIYEN CHEN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MARLON RIVERA'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

1/25/2018: SUMMONS -

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marlon Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial ((1x6mos)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 4B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, HANG MUN CHOI, FRANK CHEN, AND MEIYEN CHEN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MARLON RIVERA'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Hang Mun Choi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hang Mun Choi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marlon Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marlon Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691789    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

On January 25, 2018, plaintiff Marlon Rivera (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants Hang Mun Choi and John Weaver for damages and injuries relating to a motor vehicle collision that occurred on December 7, 2017. Defendants Hang Mun Choi, Frank Chen and Meiyen Chen (collectively, “Defendants”) filed an answer on May 3, 2018. Plaintiff seeks a protective order under Code of Civil Procedure section 2019.030 limiting Defendants to one medical examination and no psychological examination.

In any case in which a plaintiff is seeking recovery for personal injuries, any defendant may demand one physical examination of the plaintiff. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2032.220, subd. (a).) Where any party seeks to obtain discovery by a physical examination other than that described in Section 2032.220, or by a mental examination, the party shall obtain leave of the court. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2032.310, subd. (a).) “The only statutorily authorized justification for ordering a mental examination is that the ‘mental condition’ of the examinee is ‘in controversy.’” (Doyle v. Superior Court (1996) 50 Cal.App.4th 1878, 1886.) In the absence of an allegation that plaintiff has any current mental injury as a result of defendant’s alleged conduct, her present mental condition is not directly relevant. (Ibid.) “Mental examinations are not authorized for the purpose of testing a person’s ‘credibility.’” (Ibid.) When a party stipulates that “no claim is being made for mental and emotional distress over and above that usually associated with the physical injuries claimed” and “no expert testimony regarding this usual mental and emotional distress will be presented at trial,” the court cannot order a mental examination except on a showing of exceptional circumstances. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2032.220, subd. (b)-(c).)

Defendants noticed two medical examinations – orthopedic and neurological – and a neuropsychological examination. Plaintiff asserts that the case primarily involves a lumbar back injury and back surgery. Plaintiff stipulated he: (1) is not making any claim for damages based upon any diagnosis of ADHD, anxiety, depression, or any other psychological or psychiatric disorder, arising from the automobile accident; (2) is not making any claim for mental and emotional distress over and above that usually associated with the orthopedic injuries claimed; (3) will not offer expert testimony regarding mental and emotional distress at trial in support of damages; (4) will not assert mental, emotional or psychological distress as a basis for lost income or an inability to earn income; and (5) is not making a traumatic brain injury claim either now or in the future. (Declaration of Douglas Shaffer, Exh. 2.)

In opposition, Defendants argue Plaintiff asserts ongoing emotional injuries, and orthopedic, psychological and neurological conditions. Plaintiff has had prior injuries and accidents, which Defendants say are probative of the issue of causation. Defendants contend that both an orthopedic exam and a neurological exam are necessary because Plaintiff alleges he experienced “foot drop,” “foot dragging,” carpal tunnel syndrome, and loss of consciousness and that each specialist needs to interpret these conditions to assess Plaintiff’s claims. In his reply, Plaintiff does not address this point at all. Given Plaintiff’s list of injuries, which do not all appear to be related to a back injury, Defendant has shown good cause for conducting both an orthopedic examination and neurological examination. The motion is therefore DENIED on this point.

Defendant also argues exceptional circumstances exist to permit a mental examination under section 2032.320. Defendants argue Plaintiff’s history of mental illness makes it difficult to isolate the normal distress Plaintiff experienced. However, Defendants submit no evidence that Plaintiff’s limited claim for the type of mental and emotional distress usually associated with his physical injuries would be difficult to ascertain. Defendants have not shown exceptional circumstances warranting a mental examination of Plaintiff. The motion for a protective order is GRANTED on the psychological examination.

In sum, Plaintiff’s motion for a protective order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants may take the orthopedic and neurological examinations according to Defendants’ notices of those examinations. Defendants may not conduct a psychological examination.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.