This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 04:50:05 (UTC).

MARLON QUESADA VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 MARLON QUESADA filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7256

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

QUESADA MARLON

Defendants and Respondents

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF'S

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1 TO 50

MCDONNELL JIM SHERIFF OF LA COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHINEE RICHARD A. ESQ.

RAINS LUCIA STERN ST. PHALLE & SILVER

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HAUSMAN JEFFREY M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

ORDER DENYING AS MOOT THE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDATE

2/28/2018: ORDER DENYING AS MOOT THE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDATE

NOTICE OF RULING

3/1/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order

1/2/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF COMMANDER ALICIA AULT IN SUPPORT OF COUNTY OF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES OPPOSITION BRIEF

1/2/2018: DECLARATION OF COMMANDER ALICIA AULT IN SUPPORT OF COUNTY OF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES OPPOSITION BRIEF

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

4/12/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/12/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ETC

4/12/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ETC

COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; ETC

4/12/2017: COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; ETC

Minute Order

4/12/2017: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

4/26/2017: OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS TO RESPONDENTS' EVIDENCE

4/28/2017: PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS TO RESPONDENTS' EVIDENCE

Minute Order

5/3/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/23/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

6/1/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

6/14/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order

7/21/2017: Minute Order

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); County of Los Angeles, Sheriff's (Defendant); Mcdonnell, Jim, Sheriff of LA County (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • JUDGMENT DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • at 09:32 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate (Hearing--Writ of Mandate; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • ORDER DENYING AS MOOT THE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 86; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Marlon Quesada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAUSMAN JEFFREY MARK