This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 16:49:11 (UTC).

MARLENE GARZA VS 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 MARLENE GARZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1579

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARZA MARLENE

Defendant

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WAINFELD GABRIEL HORACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARLENE GARZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARLENE GARZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARLENE GARZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARLENE GARZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 CENTS ONLY STORES is a litigant