This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 05:07:13 (UTC).

MARLA TORRES VS STATER BROS MARKETS

Case Summary

On 12/11/2017 MARLA TORRES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATER BROS MARKETS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6440

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TORRES MARLA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

STATER BROS. MARKETS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BRANDT BRENDAN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

12/11/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

SUMMONS

12/11/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by David, Azizi, Esq. (Attorney); Marla Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by David, Azizi, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of David J. Porras in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One); Filed by Stater Bros. Markets (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of David J. Porras in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One); Filed by Stater Bros. Markets (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Stater Bros. Markets (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of David J. Porras in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One); Filed by Stater Bros. Markets (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Stater Bros. Markets (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Stater Bros. Markets (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint); Filed by Stater Bros. Markets (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons); Filed by Marla Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marla Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6440    Hearing Date: November 27, 2019    Dept: 2

Torres v. Stater Bros. Markets

Defendant’s Three Motions to Compel Plaintiff’s Verified Answers to Form Interrogatories, Set One; Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Production of Documents, Set One; filed on 10/30/19, are DENIED.

Motions concerning discovery must be heard on or before the 15th day prior to trial. Cal Code Civil Procedure ; 2024.020.

The court’s file reflects that on 5/30/19, the parties stipulated to continue trial to 12/3/19, with all discovery and motion cut-off dates to be based on the new trial date.

The last day to hear motions concerning discovery was 11/18/19. The motions are untimely.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stater Bros. Markets is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDT BRENDAN W.