Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 07:42:41 (UTC).

MARK WOLCHUK VS TUFELD CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 MARK WOLCHUK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TUFELD CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0919

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

WOLCHUK MARK

M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION INC.

M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION INC. GOODFAITH

WOLCHUK PLUMBING INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

TUFELD CORPORATION

BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY LP

DOES 1 TO 25

Other

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TREYZON BORIS ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KIRK & MYERS

OFFENHAUSER TYLER D. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF KIRK & MYERS

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA

Cross Defendant Attorney

YOKA & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

3/2/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

CROSS-DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION; DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS

5/1/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION; DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS

DECLARATION OF MIKE BROWN

5/22/2018: DECLARATION OF MIKE BROWN

CROSS DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.S AMENDED RELY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/29/2018: CROSS DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.S AMENDED RELY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

CROSS-DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION SOUGHT BY BEVERIN HILLS GATEWAY, L.P

7/19/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION SOUGHT BY BEVERIN HILLS GATEWAY, L.P

NOTICE ENTRY JUDGMENT/ORDER FILING DISMISS & PROOF OF SERVICE

7/23/2018: NOTICE ENTRY JUDGMENT/ORDER FILING DISMISS & PROOF OF SERVICE

CROSS-DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO THE NOTICE OF ORDER FILED BY BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, LP

7/26/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO THE NOTICE OF ORDER FILED BY BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, LP

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

8/7/2018: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

CROSS-DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

9/21/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

CROSS DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION INC.S NOTICE OF ENTRY COURT ORDER FINDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

10/1/2018: CROSS DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION INC.S NOTICE OF ENTRY COURT ORDER FINDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

Request for Dismissal

12/31/2018: Request for Dismissal

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND POSTING OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 631

11/3/2017: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND POSTING OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 631

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

11/2/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/12/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/10/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/30/2017: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/19/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Answer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by Mark Wolchuk (Cross-Defendant); Wolchuk Plumbing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue the trial and all trial related dates by stipulation) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue the trial and all...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Defendant's notice of ex parte and ex parte application to continue the trial and all trial related dates by stipulation; memorandum of points and authorities; declaration of Lyle B. Trainer; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway LP (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (--With Prejudice--on the Complaint as to Defendant MP Monte Construction, Inc. ONLY); Filed by Mark Wolchuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Summons (on Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway LP (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • CROSS DEFENDANT M.P. MONTE CONSTRUCTION INC.S NOTICE OF ENTRY COURT ORDER FINDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Summons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR TOTAL INDEMNITY, IMPLIED PARTIAL INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF, EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT AND EXPRESS INDEMNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mark Wolchuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mark Wolchuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Mark Wolchuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where TUFELD CORPORATION is a litigant