This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:08:15 (UTC).

MARK VERDUZCO VS IRMA VERDUZCO

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by MARK VERDUZCO against IRMA VERDUZCO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1634

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VERDUZCO MARK

Respondents and Defendants

VERDUZCO IRMA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

 

Court Documents

Declaration

4/3/2019: Declaration

Motion to Compel

4/3/2019: Motion to Compel

Notice

4/30/2019: Notice

Minute Order

5/1/2019: Minute Order

Motion in Limine

6/14/2019: Motion in Limine

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/29/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/29/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PLAINTIFFS MARK VERDUZCO?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

3/29/2018: PLAINTIFFS MARK VERDUZCO?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/13/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

3/13/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/5/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS

1/29/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. ASSAULT; ETC

1/29/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. ASSAULT; ETC

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Motion in Limine (PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF, OR REFERENCE TO, DISPUTED EVIDENCE OF CONDUCT BY PLAINTIFF ALLEGEDLY OCCURRING OVER 30 YEARS AGO; DECLARATION OF EDUARDO OLIVO IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Mark Verduzco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiffs Excuted Authorzation) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Excuted Authorzation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice (of Taking Motion for an Order to Compel Executed Medical Authorizations OFF CALENDAR); Filed by Irma Verduzco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Declaration (of Danielle M. Doumar in Support of Motion to Compel); Filed by Irma Verduzco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Medical Record Authorization); Filed by Irma Verduzco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS MARK VERDUZCO S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Mark Verduzco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Mark Verduzco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Irma Verduzco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Irma Verduzco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mark Verduzco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. ASSAULT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Mark Verduzco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691634    Hearing Date: March 23, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex parte denied.  Because the court is closed to non-emergency motions until April 17, the motion hearing date cannot be advanced.  Parties who intend to submit on this tentative should send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.  Parties who submit do not need to appear.  Any party intending to file an opposition to the ex parte application shall, in addition to filing the opposition, email the opposition to SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org by March 23, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.  If a party intends to appear, the Court STRONGLY ENCOURAGES counsel to appear via Court Call.