This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2022 at 16:32:50 (UTC).

MARK TREBOTICH VS DWAYNE BENISH

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 MARK TREBOTICH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DWAYNE BENISH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0966

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TREBOTICH MARK

Defendant

BENISH DWAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBER MARK

Defendant Attorney

YUN CHARLES C

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

5/27/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

10/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Mark Trebotich on 01/10/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Mark Trebotich as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Mark Trebotich (Plaintiff); As to: Dwayne Benish (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Dwayne Benish (Defendant); As to: Mark Trebotich (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mark Trebotich (Plaintiff); As to: Dwayne Benish (Defendant); Service Date: 04/28/2022; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mark Trebotich (Plaintiff); As to: Dwayne Benish (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark Trebotich (Plaintiff); As to: Dwayne Benish (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mark Trebotich (Plaintiff); As to: Dwayne Benish (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEBER MARK