This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2020 at 22:22:15 (UTC).

MARK STEINES ET AL VS CROWN MEDIA UNITED STATES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 MARK STEINES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CROWN MEDIA UNITED STATES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2533

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

STEINES MARK

STEINES ENTERTAINMENT INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

CROWN MEDIA UNITED STATES LLC

CROWN MEDIA

CITI TEEVEE LLC

CROWN HOLDINGS

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

CROWN MEDIA HOLDINGS INC

CROWN MEDIA FAMILY NETWORKS

MEDIA CROWN

HOLDINGS CROWN

CROWN MEDIA HOLDINGS INC. DBA CROWN MEDIA DBA CROWN HOLDINGS

CROWN MEDIA UNITED STATES LLC DBA CROWN MEDIA FAMILY NETWORKS

Respondents, Defendants and Not Classified By Court

CROWN MEDIA FAMILY NETWORKS

MEDIA CROWN

HOLDINGS CROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BLOOM FIRM THE

BLOOM LISA

GLICK GAIL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

9/20/2018: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. RETALIATION; 2. WRONGFUL DISCHARGE 1N VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; 3. FAILURE TO PREVENT RETALIATION; 4. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAI

9/26/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. RETALIATION; 2. WRONGFUL DISCHARGE 1N VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; 3. FAILURE TO PREVENT RETALIATION; 4. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAI

Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

10/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

10/31/2018: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/23/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 05/13/2019

5/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 05/13/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL)

5/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL)

Substitution of Attorney

5/22/2019: Substitution of Attorney

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mark Steines (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re status of removal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re status of removal) of 05/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re status of removal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Crown Media United States, LLC (Defendant); Crown Media Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Citi Teevee, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mark Steines (Plaintiff); Steines Entertainment, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mark Steines (Plaintiff); Steines Entertainment, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mark Steines (Plaintiff); Steines Entertainment, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. RETALIATION; 2. WRONGFUL DISCHARGE 1N VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; 3. FAILURE TO PREVENT RETALIATION; 4. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Steines Entertainment, Inc. (Plaintiff); Mark Steines (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Mark Steines (Plaintiff); Steines Entertainment, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Steines (Plaintiff); Steines Entertainment, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN MEDIA HOLDINGS INC. CROWN MEDIA& CROWN HOLDINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where CROWN HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CROWN MEDIA UNITED STATES LLC is a litigant