This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 07:07:53 (UTC).

MARK ROUTH VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 MARK ROUTH filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2651

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

3M COMPANY

AMCORD INC.

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES

BROTHER INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

CALPORTLAND COMPANY AKA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

CONAIR CORP.

DCO LLC FKA DANA COMPANIES LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

EDELBROCK LLC

FEDERAL MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST

FREE BUILDERS SUPPLY INC.

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY AKA NAPA AUTO PARTS

GILLETTE CO DBA PROCTER & GAMBLE

GLAMOUR INDUSTRIES CO.

HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

JOHN K. BICE CO. INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

MCCORD CORPORATION FKA MCCORD GASKET CORPORATION

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

AMEELE MELANIE L.

BERKES ROBERT

BOWLBY STEPHANIE LYN

DONOHO TAYLOR N.

DUFFY JOSEPH

HUGO EDWARD R

SPANGLER VIIU

IRWIN GEORGE HUMPHRIES

KADABA SEEMA N.

KAPLAN BRADLEY P.

KARBASSI NILOFAR

LEE FRED B

MEYERS LESA M.

MILBRODT JEREMY

PEATMAN STEPHANIE GHANEM

SOLOMON KIMBERLY ERIN

Other Attorneys

BROWN ERIC LOREN

DEBLASE PATRICK ANDREW

EYERLY MICHAEL C.

HUANG AILEEN

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (DEBLASE BROWN EYERLY, LLP GROUP STATUS CON...)

1/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (DEBLASE BROWN EYERLY, LLP GROUP STATUS CON...)

Substitution of Attorney

12/6/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

11/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Substitution of Attorney

11/1/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/25/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

10/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - DEFENDANT AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY; RESERVATION OF RIGHT TO TRIAL BY JURY

9/14/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY; RESERVATION OF RIGHT TO TRIAL BY JURY

Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH

9/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BROTHER INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES - ASBESTOS

8/31/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BROTHER INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES - ASBESTOS

Answer - DEFENDANT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

8/29/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

Notice - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OFF CALENDAR

8/26/2022: Notice - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OFF CALENDAR

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

8/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Request for Dismissal

8/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT PFIZER INC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF RHONDA R. TROTTER

8/25/2022: Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT PFIZER INC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF RHONDA R. TROTTER

Request for Dismissal

8/24/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

8/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - OF DEFENDANT DCO LLC TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

8/22/2022: Answer - OF DEFENDANT DCO LLC TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT AMCORD, INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

8/19/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT AMCORD, INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • Hearing05/24/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference (DeBlase Brown Eyerly, LLP Group Status Con...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Parex Usa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference (DeBlase Brown Eyerly, LLP Group Status Conference) scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/04/2023 01:45 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Pneumo-Abex, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: DCo, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: Mark Routh (Plaintiff); As to: Conair LLC of CA Erroneously Sued As Conair Corp. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Mark Routh (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant); As to: Mark Routh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDefendant American International Industries Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint For Personal Injury; Reservation Of Right To Trial By Jury; Filed by: American International Industries (AII) (sued individually and erroneously as successor to PINAUD, INC., BARBARA ALICE, INC., ED PINAUD, INC. d/b/a ED. PINAUD, and NESTLE-LE MUR COMPANY) Erroneously Sued As American International Industries (Defendant); As to: Mark Routh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mark Routh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mark Routh (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); American International Industries (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mark Routh (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); American International Industries (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark Routh (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); American International Industries (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAMOUR INDUSTRIES CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FREE BUILDERS SUPPLY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BROTHER INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant