This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 18:08:12 (UTC).

MARK ROMANO VS KYLE HARA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 MARK ROMANO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KYLE HARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1285

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMANO MARK

Defendants

HARA JIMMY

HARA KYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LONG H.G.

LONG HELEN GRAYCE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail

1/10/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2022: Notice of Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanction and Service pursuant to Rules 3.110(b) and 3.110(f) of the California Rules of Court, or in alternative an Order for Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by MARK ROMANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by MARK ROMANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARK ROMANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARK ROMANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARK ROMANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE