This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 01:50:48 (UTC).

MARK PHILLIP LEMRISE ET AL VS TGS TRANSPORTATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by MARK PHILLIP LEMRISE against TGS TRANSPORTATION INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2555

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LEMRISE ESTATE OF DENISE MICHELLE

Respondents and Defendants

SCHNEIDER PETER HAMILTON

DOES 1 TO 50

TGS TRANSPORTATION INC

Minor

LEMRISE MADALINE ROSE

Guardian Ad Litem

LEMRISE MARK PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE RE; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/22/2018: NOTICE RE; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Request for Dismissal

12/18/2018: Request for Dismissal

Answer

3/27/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/27/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

5/31/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Minute Order

6/10/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

6/10/2019: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for

6/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Motion to Consolidate

6/26/2019: Motion to Consolidate

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

7/31/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

7/31/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

2/21/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPUCATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

2/21/2018: APPUCATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

1/31/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Motion to Consolidate; Filed by TGS Transportation Inc (Defendant); Peter Hamilton Schneider (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • at 3:00 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by TGS Transportation Inc (Defendant); Peter Hamilton Schneider (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Case) of 06/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by TGS Transportation Inc (Defendant); Peter Hamilton Schneider (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Answer (to Complaint); Filed by TGS Transportation Inc (Defendant); Peter Hamilton Schneider (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by TGS Transportation Inc (Defendant); Peter Hamilton Schneider (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Madaline Rose Lemrise (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • NOTICE RE; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • APPUCATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Lemrise, Estate of Denise Michelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692555    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Madaline Hofeling (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Shelley Sours (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendants Peter Schneider and TGS Transportation, Inc. in exchange for $650,000.00. If approved, $0 will be used for medical expenses, $162,500.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $217.50 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $487,282.50 for Claimant to be invested into a single-premium deferred annuity which will provide for periodic payments beginning when Claimant is 18 years old, in less than a year.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the December 18, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.