This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 16:11:52 (UTC).

MARK IVANYO VS BROUTIAN ENTERPRISES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 MARK IVANYO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BROUTIAN ENTERPRISES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0777

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IVANYO MARK

Defendants

BROUTIAN ENTERPRISES INC. DBA DBA HAROUTS BMW

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLITZKE MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(D)

8/19/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(D)

Complaint

8/19/2021: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

8/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/19/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • Hearing12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mark Ivanyo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Mark Ivanyo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(d)); Filed by Mark Ivanyo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address); Filed by Mark Ivanyo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Ivanyo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mark Ivanyo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLITZKE MICHAEL A.