This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 07:03:07 (UTC).

MARK H. GASTON VS LIFE WALK SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 MARK H GASTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIFE WALK SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2726

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GASTON MARK H.

Defendants

BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION

EVANS MONIQUE

FADLON RACHEL

LIFE WALK SERVICES INC.

ON DEMAND PLUMBING

SHALOM BUILDING LLC

SOUTH LOS ANGELES REGIONAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ RICHARD MARC

LOPEZ ROGER WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/11/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/11/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/11/2022: Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARK

10/31/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARK

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

10/31/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2024
  • Hearing07/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 10/26/2022 to 10/31/2022; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Mark; Filed by: Mark H. Gaston (Plaintiff); As to: Mark H. Gaston (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Richard Marc Katz (Attorney): Organization Name changed from The Law Offices of Richard M Katz to Law Ofc Richard M Katz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mark H. Gaston (Plaintiff); As to: Life Walk Services, Inc. (Defendant); Monique Evans (Defendant); Shalom Building, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark H. Gaston (Plaintiff); As to: Life Walk Services, Inc. (Defendant); Monique Evans (Defendant); Shalom Building, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark H. Gaston (Plaintiff); As to: Life Walk Services, Inc. (Defendant); Monique Evans (Defendant); Shalom Building, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRADFORD-WHITE CORPORATION A DE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ ROGER WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZ RICAHRD M.