This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 09:29:34 (UTC).

MARK GOMEZ, ET AL. VS YESSENIA EILEEN MARTINEZ-DELGADO

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 MARK GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YESSENIA EILEEN MARTINEZ-DELGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4798

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOMEZ MARK

ROSALES MELISSA

Defendant

MARTINEZ-DELGADO YESSENIA EILEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELL LAURENCE H

Defendant Attorney

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

7/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/17/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

8/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/13/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2024
  • Hearing07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Yessenia Eileen Martinez-Delgado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Yessenia Eileen Martinez-Delgado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Yessenia Eileen Martinez-Delgado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yessenia Eileen Martinez-Delgado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mark Gomez (Plaintiff); Melissa Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Gomez (Plaintiff); Melissa Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mark Gomez (Plaintiff); Melissa Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mark Gomez (Plaintiff); Melissa Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADEM STEPHANIE N.