This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:57:27 (UTC).

MARK GARCIA VS CAM LOAN VO ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by MARK GARCIA against CAM LOAN VO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8800

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA MARK

Defendants and Respondents

PROFESSINAIL

PROFESSIONAIL

DOES 1 TO 50

VO CAM LOAN

LE NHAT TAN

 

Court Documents

Other -

5/23/2018: Other -

Answer

5/23/2018: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/22/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

7/2/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/21/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

3/21/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

SUMMONS

3/21/2018: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Cam Loan Vo (Defendant); ProfessioNail (Defendant); Nhat Tan Le (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Cam Loan Vo (Defendant); Nhat Tan Le (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Cam Loan Vo (Defendant); ProfessioNail (Defendant); Nhat Tan Le (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Cam Loan Vo (Defendant); ProfessioNail (Defendant); Nhat Tan Le (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mark Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mark Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Mark Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698800    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

MARK GARCIA,

Plaintiff,

v.

CAM LOAN VO, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC698800

Hearing Date: January 7, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Plaintiff’s counsel, Min N. Thai of Splinter & Thai, LLP (“Counsel”), moves to be relieved as counsel. Counsel filed the instant motion to be relieved as counsel on November 20, 2019. Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is material disagreements between Counsel and Plaintiff, which is a valid basis for withdrawal. (See State Bar of California, Rules of Professional Conduct, Rule 3-700(C)(1)(d)-(f).) The proofs of service attached to these documents show the documents were served on Plaintiff. Plaintiff has not objected to the Court granting the motion. Therefore, the motion is granted. However, the Court is concerned that the upcoming trial date of March 23, 2020, does not afford Plaintiff sufficient time to retain new counsel or to prepare for trial as a self-represented party. Therefore, the Court continues the trial date.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Counsel’s motion to be relieved is granted. The Court advances and vacates the final status conference and trial dates and sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: September 11, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: September 25, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be governed by the new trial date. Counsel should note that the order will become effective upon the filing of proofs of service of signed copies of the order on Plaintiff—and Counsel has properly checked the appropriate box on the proposed order for this. Counsel will remain the attorney of record until Counsel files with the court proofs of service of the signed orders. Counsel must serve copies of the signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 10 days, and file proofs of service thereof. Counsel shall serve a copy of this order, as well as the Court’s signed form order.

DATED: January 7, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court